CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a community hall for the benefits of all Finchampstead residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £19,116 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wokingham
Governance
- 15 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROLAND HENRY CUNDY | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Yvonne Carol Pett Ridge | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Pauline Lesley Grainger | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
KATHERINE JANE GEDDES | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacquie Sheila Perryman | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN WARWICK | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
ALISON JAYNE RUMBLE | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Peter Bromley | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.26k | £27.60k | £26.54k | £26.52k | £45.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.93k | £35.67k | £16.94k | £24.13k | £45.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £3.77k | £1.22k | £19.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY DEMISED TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER PROPERTY AS MAY BE ACQUIRED BY THE TRUSTEES SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FINCHAMPSTEAD IN THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FINCHAMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
175 Nine Mile Ride
Finchampstead
Wokingham
RG40 4JD
- Phone:
- 01189733553
- Email:
- secretary@ratepayers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window