FRIENDS OF THE MARKET CROSS SURGERY MILDENHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engaged in activities which support the surgery and advance the health care of its patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 16 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON TRETT | Chair | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BERRY | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRETA THURSTON | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Alecock | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter Alder | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Adrian Peachey | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JOYCE PEACHEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £2.47k | £51.59k | £1.27k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £440 | £6.54k | £14.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS ADOPTED 29/02/00
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MILDENHALL AND SURROUNDING AREA. THROUGH THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES THAT SUPPORT THE MARKET CROSS SURGERY IN MILDENHALL AND ADVANCE THE HEALTH CARE OF ITS PATIENTS AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SURGERY WHICH WOULD NOT BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY OR OTHERWISE PROVIDED OUT OF STATUTORY FUNDS
Area of benefit
MILDENHALL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whiting Llp
46 St. Andrews Street
Mildenhall
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP28 7HB
- Phone:
- 01638712267
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window