COUNCIL FOR BRITISH RESEARCH IN THE LEVANT

Charity number: 1073015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £907.82k £851.33k £894.32k £923.62k £984.37k
Total expenditure £867.11k £797.82k £905.61k £865.43k £803.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £739.46k £701.06k £738.95k £756.96k £742.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £161.71k £150.12k £155.28k £166.16k £241.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £248 £158 £90 £492 £1.19k
Income - Other £6.40k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £848.74k £757.29k £841.77k £755.38k £680.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.37k £40.53k £63.84k £110.05k £122.70k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £17.61k £13.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0