Accounts and annual returns THE BOVEY TRACEY PLAYERS

Charity number: 1108788
Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 203 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 203 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 09 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 16 March 2022 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 01 October 2020 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required