MEHR MUTUAL CONCERN

Charity number: 1072561
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2021 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 April 2021 167 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 October 2017 On time Download