MEHR MUTUAL CONCERN

Charity number: 1072561
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.64k £603.55k £66.97k £42.67k £38.28k
Total expenditure £9.35k £11.65k £12.83k £30.46k £18.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £600.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £299 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £3.25k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £7.22k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.01k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £3.42k N/A N/A N/A