Trustees MEHR MUTUAL CONCERN
Charity number: 1072561

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEHDI HASNAIN HUSSAIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Bryan Reynolds | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID IQBAL | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALI MOOSVI | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS RIDAH IQBAL | Trustee | 03 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
OONA HASSIM | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LISTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAJESH SAINI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.