Financial history CORAM FAMILY AND CHILDCARE LTD

Charity number: 1077444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.03m £661.39k £526.11k £425.98k £502.07k
Total expenditure £1.55m £1.15m £1.03m £400.60k £371.34k
Income from government contracts £163.75k £90.27k £95.35k N/A £147.12k
Income from government grants £364.81k £348.91k £262.41k £107.74k £7.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.34k £494 £1.11k N/A £2.11k
Income - Other trading activities £1.46k £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £967.72k £647.52k £521.70k N/A £492.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £17.28k £13.37k £3.30k N/A £136
Income - Other £41.35k £0 £0 N/A £7.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.01m £576.82k N/A £337.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds £180.19k £139.34k £54.23k N/A £34.11k
Expenditure - Governance £40.95k £35.53k £26.45k N/A £7.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £6.00k £0 £397.33k N/A £0