Helping Herts Homeless

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Owner of a hostel which provides basic accommodation for relieving homelessness in North Hertfordshire. Acts as a hub and donates funds to support the work of other charities involved in supporting the homeless in Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 18 September 1998: Standard registration
- HELPING HERTS HOMELESS (Previous name)
- NORTH HERTS SANCTUARY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Bridge | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Poole | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Owain Paul Lister | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Paul Chapman | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
peter warren | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.99k | £37.86k | £39.25k | £33.58k | £59.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.27k | £28.69k | £33.23k | £18.87k | £35.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 9 AUGUST 2005 as amended on 23 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS BY: A) THE PROVISION OF YEAR ROUND TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION B) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND FACILITIES THAT HELP AND ENCOURAGE HOMELESS PEOPLE TO ADDRESS THE UNDERLYING REASONS FOR HOMELESSNESS IN PARTICULAR PERSONS EXPERIENCING DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY, MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DIFFICULTIES OR INVOLVEMENT IN CRIMINAL ACTIVITY
Area of benefit
NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o H W Associates
Portmill House
Portmill Lane
HITCHIN
Herts
SG5 1DJ
- Phone:
- 01462600425
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window