WADDINGTON ALL SAINTS P T A

Charity number: 1071694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 January 2021 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required