WADDINGTON ALL SAINTS P T A

Charity number: 1071694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kay Holmes Trustee 05 October 2016 None on record
Caroline Riley Chair 05 October 2016 None on record
SUE GUY Trustee 05 April 2011 None on record
Elizabeth Nguyen Trustee 04 November 2018 None on record
Helen Petts Trustee 05 October 2016 None on record
Sally-Ann Mills Trustee 05 October 2016 None on record
Alison Carr Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Sarah Lockhart Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
Elizabeth Curley Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record