Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION MABLETHORPE AND SUTTON-ON-SEA

Charity number: 1071670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £12.77k £11.56k £15.36k £10.62k £9.39k
Total expenditure £10.23k £14.49k £13.47k £4.17k £7.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £550 N/A N/A N/A