Accounts and annual returns BECCLES BRANCH CAISTER LIFEBOAT

Charity number: 1074544
Charity reporting is overdue by 1226 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 130 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 130 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 495 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 495 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 860 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 860 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1226 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1226 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required