Financial history BECCLES BRANCH CAISTER LIFEBOAT

Charity number: 1074544
Charity reporting is overdue by 1161 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £2.84k £1.97k £2 £2 £50
Total expenditure £2.02k £1.21k £385 £194 £185
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A