CARDIFF AND VALE OF GLAMORGAN PARENTS FEDERATION (LEARNING DISABILITIES)

Charity number: 1076847
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time Download