ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION GLOUCESTER BRANCH

Charity Number: 1071848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The elected almoner visits anyone who the branch feels may need help irrespective of where they are, home or hospital and has individual authority to do anything needed to eleviate the problem.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £362
Total expenditure: £1,685

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Stoyles Chair 27 January 2017
None on record
Helen Hanley Trustee 10 February 2023
None on record
ROGER REA Trustee 28 January 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £877 £12.85k £17.37k £14.75k £362
Total expenditure £386 £261 £30.79k £11.21k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 March 2022 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
92 Whaddon Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 5NF
Phone:
07354 755813
Website:

No information available