MORVAH ACTION FOR THE COMMUNITY AND ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1072889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 08 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 06 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 19 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2017 On time Download