MORVAH ACTION FOR THE COMMUNITY AND ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1072889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £50.58k £59.02k £62.11k £64.93k £29.54k
Total expenditure £46.85k £52.26k £58.03k £61.88k £22.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.66k