ST. ANNE'S STAY AND PLAY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide child care at St Annes Fun House, Bewdley both before and after school and also run a holiday club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 June 1999: Standard registration
- ST ANNES STAY & PLAY LIMITED (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dodd | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marrissa Bella Wilson-Wilcox | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER JANE SKELTON | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.68k | £84.37k | £78.73k | £79.33k | £67.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.35k | £78.64k | £78.59k | £88.79k | £69.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £26.74k | £12.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 August 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2021 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2021 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
A)TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS;AND B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL FACILITIES; AND C) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEWDLEY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISISON OF LOW CAST ACCOMMODATION TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stans Place
Wyre Hill
BEWDLEY
Worcestershire
DY12 2UQ
- Phone:
- 07947048124
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window