SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED INFECTION RESEARCH FOUNDATION (STIRF)

Charity number: 1075316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £40.04k £48 £90.04k £68 £44.04k
Total expenditure £828 £6.33k £60.82k £59.18k £34.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A