SOCIETY FOR NAME STUDIES IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 1077455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £18.41k £18.41k £22.50k £17.06k £3.09k
Total expenditure £15.90k £15.90k £20.63k £14.61k £1.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A