THE THAMES FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1074794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Thames Festival Trust's focus is on engaging a wide public in art, heritage, education, environmental and well-being programmes that reveal our rivers' rich natural environment, share their unique history, protect their sustainability, and celebrate the diverse connections they make for us with the wider world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE MAYOR'S THAMES FESTIVAL (Working name)
  • THE THAMES FESTIVAL (Working name)
  • THAMES FESTIVAL TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Warrington Chair 17 March 2020
BRAINSTRUST
Received: On time
Sandra Dawe Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
Kate Sandars Trustee 23 January 2023
None on record
Angel Gavieiro Besteiro Trustee 23 January 2023
None on record
Rosanna Manuela Machado Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Alistair Gale Trustee 05 February 2019
None on record
Andrew John Cooke Trustee 27 June 2014
None on record
Pete Stephens Trustee 09 July 2013
None on record
OLGA STANOJLOVIC Trustee 25 November 2012
FATHER NIKOLICH'S SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
Dr HENRY FAJEMIROKUN Trustee
ROSSALL SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £940.03k £554.59k £471.45k £728.46k £604.98k
Total expenditure £791.55k £467.40k £503.59k £560.57k £455.95k
Income from government contracts £5.00k £22.02k £30.55k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £92.50k £17.50k £10.00k N/A £21.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £729.87k £513.22k N/A £514.58k £576.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £213.68k £0
Income - Charitable activities £210.15k £41.37k N/A £0 £23.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A £200 £5.24k
Income - Other £4 £3 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £727.56k £413.49k N/A £509.52k £372.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.09k £53.91k N/A £51.05k £83.59k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £11.90k £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £6.52k N/A £3.91k £2.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Other assets £344.11k £411.81k N/A £653.50k £701.63k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £46.76k £33.78k N/A £137.12k £34.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 September 2021 313 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thames Festival Trust
7 Bell Yard
LONDON
WC2A 2JR
Phone:
02079288998