BOSTON AND DISTRICT CAT WELFARE

Charity number: 1091594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £20.88k £17.15k £25.46k £13.03k £17.72k
Total expenditure £17.79k £13.32k £23.36k £14.26k £18.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A