INTERCONTINENTAL CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1072584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 1851 AS AMENDED ON 1 MAY 1861, 7 MAY 1958, 10 JUNE 1976, 11 JUNE 1979, 25 MAY 1982, 28 JUNE 1983, 18 JUNE 1986, 17 JUNE 1998, 1 JANUARY 1999, 14 JULY 2004, 7 JULY 2009, 23 NOVEMBER 2019 AND 19 MARCH 2020
Charitable objects
TO SEND CLERGYMEN, LAYWORKERS AND TEACHERS TO BRITISH RESIDENTS AND OTHER ENGLISH-SPEAKING PEOPLE ABROAD.
Area of benefit
UK AND EUROPE
Registration history
  • 26 July 1999 : Standard registration