INTERCONTINENTAL CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1072584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VERY REVD TIMOTHY WRIGHT Trustee 17 September 2016 None on record
ELIZABETH DUMAIN Trustee 11 September 2020 None on record
ROGER ANTHONY HOYLE Trustee 01 October 2019
THE DISABILITIES TRUST Received: On time
Calen Ebere Lee Gayle Trustee 09 September 2021 None on record
CHRISTOPHER STEWART WELLER FCA, Trustee 17 September 2016 None on record
Rev LAURENCE JOHN BIGGS Trustee 11 September 2020
ROMANIA CARE Received: On time
THROW A STARFISH Received: On time
The Right Reverend Richard Charles Jackson Chair 07 September 2017
MISS HANNAH ELIZA ARKLE'S BEQUEST FOR HEREFORD DIOCESAN SUNDAY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE HARLEY CHARITY Received: 42 days late
WRIGHT'S CHARITY SCHOOL Received: On time
EVESON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Rev GARY IAN WILTON Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Rev Martin Nicholas Dale Trustee 18 September 2018
THE ELY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Rev Folorunso Oladosu Olokose Trustee 01 October 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY OATLANDS Received: On time
Elizabeth Diane Skudder Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Rev KEVIN DAVID MENTZEL Trustee 11 September 2020 None on record
Rev Michael Barry Sanders Trustee 23 September 2014 None on record
Revd Dr Stephen John Hance Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
ANN CHRISTINE TYNDALL Trustee 19 September 2015 None on record