Accounts and annual returns HMC PROJECTS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE

Charity number: 1074491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 June 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 June 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 October 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 October 2020 106 days late Download Open in new window