Trustees HMC PROJECTS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE
Charity number: 1074491

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Christopher Jackson | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Francis Vick | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Sara Gandee | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Michael Phelan | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joy Hopkinson | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS WILLIAM MCPHAIL | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Mr PM de Voil | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
David John Knapman | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL CLARE FOX OWENS | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NEAL MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.