THE MALDON AND BURNHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recording the Maldon and Burnham Standard Newspaper to audio distribution medium on a weekly basis for delivery to blind/partially sighted/disabled listeners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 12 January 1999: Standard registration
- 10 May 2024: Funds received from 1051761 MALDON AND DISTRICT VISION IMPAIRED CLUB
- IN TOUCH (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Priscilla Holdsworth | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Victoria Lyle | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANITA WITHRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.10k | £5.14k | £4.56k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.40k | £652 | £1.32k | £558 | £572 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 January 2025 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MARCH 1987 AND AMENDED 23RD APRIL 1993 AND 28TH JULY 1997
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND THOSE WHO, BY REASON OF ANY INCAPACITY, WHETHER TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT, HAVE DIFFICULTY IN READING AND WHO IN ALL CASES RESIDE, OR HAVE RESIDED IN, OR IN THE VICINITY OF, THE DISTRICTS OF MALDON AND BURNHAM IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES AND THE EQUIPMENT, IF NECESSARY, REQUIRED TO LISTEN TO SUCH TAPES; 2. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS WITHIN THE DISTRICTS OF MALDON AND BURNHAM AND IN OTHER AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY THE ASSOCIATION AND BY OTHER ASSOCIATIONS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
MALDON AND BURNHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 RAMSEY CHASE
LATCHINGDON
CHELMSFORD
CM3 6JT
- Phone:
- 01621740736
- Email:
- mbtn1986@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window