HIGH FLIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons with a physical or mental disability and to improve their conditions of life by providing and assisting in the provision of flight training and associated activities and to advance the education of such persons and of children and young people generally in aviation and related subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 1999: Standard registration
- BA Highflight (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Bowen | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cheadle | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Minesh Patel | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tiina Conacher | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Dalgeish | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Pack | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hull | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Silvester | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia van Lieshout | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Godwin | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cook | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Smith | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allister Bridger | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD AGIUS | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.56k | £22.53k | £20.04k | £19.07k | £48.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.35k | £353 | £29.38k | £24.46k | £28.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH OCTOBER 1998, AMENDED 6TH JULY 1999 AND 6TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH A PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FLIGHT TRAINING AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS AND OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE GENERALLY IN AVIATION AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Flight Operations
British Airways Plc
Waterside
Speedbird Way
Harmondsworth
WEST DRA
- Phone:
- 01233756366
- Email:
- clifford.agius@ba.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window