Accounts and annual returns FRINGFORD VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1077028
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 58 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 58 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 06 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 January 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required