Financial history FRINGFORD VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1077028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £22.87k £15.22k £14.49k £14.33k £15.05k
Total expenditure £19.02k £7.81k £8.59k £10.11k £6.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £11.33k