Trustees FRINGFORD VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1077028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dennis John Bradney Trustee 24 August 2021
None on record
Melissa Morbeck Trustee 19 August 2021
None on record
Karen Anne Davies Trustee 25 June 2018
None on record
Kerry Duplessis Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
John Fargin Trustee 24 June 2016
None on record
Helen Fargin Trustee 23 June 2013
None on record
Christine Underwood Trustee 20 October 2007
None on record