ASSOCIATION FOR LEARNING LANGUAGES EN FAMILLE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of linguistic and cultural exchanges between children from the UK and children from other countries, principally France and Germany.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
Governance
- 03 March 1999: Standard registration
- 09 March 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 April 2012: Re-registered
- 07 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ALLEF UK (Working name)
- EN FAMILLE UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.45k | £1.95k | £2.65k | £1.10k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £2.52k | £3.02k | £1.19k | £4.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 20 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 23 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 18 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2004
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND IN PARTICULAR PROMOTE LINGUISTIC AND CULTURAL EXCHANGES BETWEEN CHILDREN FROM THE U.K TO OTHER COUNTRIES AND CHILDREN FROM OTHER COUNTRIES TO THE U.K AND TO ENCOURAGE CONTINUING LINKS BETWEEN THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ON SUCH VISITS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND THOSE WHOM THEY HAVE VISITED AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window