THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS CHURCH BRADENHAM

Charity number: 1073236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.24k £2.71k £4.10k £2.70k £2.54k
Total expenditure £9.17k £290 £352 £2.47k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A