Financial history THE DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S INTERNATIONAL AWARD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1072453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.85m £5.06m £2.92m £7.89m £6.04m
Total expenditure £5.71m £6.49m £6.28m £4.72m £4.46m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £141.71k £16.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.73m £3.55m £1.92m £6.43m £4.40m
Income - Other trading activities £485.00k £692.00k £132.00k £74.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £631.00k £808.00k £855.00k £1.38m £1.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £11.00k £4.00k £7.00k £4.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £6.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.74m £5.43m £5.11m £3.96m £3.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £973.00k £1.06m £1.16m £760.00k £797.00k
Expenditure - Governance £34.98k £35.92k £108.00k £95.28k £68.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £127.00k £568.00k £237.00k £340.00k £465.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £88.00k £55.23k £49.15k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0