Financial history MR HERBERT MILLER'S CHARITABLE WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1073803
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/04/2017 22/04/2018 22/04/2019 22/04/2020 22/04/2021
Total gross income £86.84k £77.91k £79.41k £41.41k £29.69k
Total expenditure £82.76k £80.46k £80.31k £71.88k £65.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A