ANGOLAN CIVIC COMMUNITIES ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1081831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.00k £3.40k £4.13k £3.81k £3.38k
Total expenditure £492 £390 £315 £437 £139
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A