BOSTON ONE STOP SHOP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Boston One Stop Shop is to promote the benefits for the interests of education and social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation for the young people of Boston. (The facility historcially included a "drop -in" centre and cyber cafe for people aged 13 - 25 years without distinction of gender, sexual orientation, race, political, religious or other opinions.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 July 1999: Standard registration
- 26 July 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1122905 LINCOLNSHIRE YOUTH MISSION LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £3 | £2 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | £40 | £40 | £40 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF BOSTON UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE LOCAL INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A DROP-IN CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAM
Area of benefit
BOSTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window