Trustees THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMITTEE FOR UNICEF

Charity number: 1072612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shatish Damodar Dasani Chair 01 September 2020
None on record
Zamila Bunglawala Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Aneil Kumar Jhumat Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Richard Charles Hawkes Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Dr Margaret Elizabeth Atkinson Trustee 10 March 2021
THE MICHAEL SIEFF FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Matthew Ferguson Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Usama Anmar Al-Qassab Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
SEAN CARNEY Trustee 14 November 2019
None on record
Sarah Davis Trustee 26 June 2017
WOMEN'S PRIZE TRUST
Overdue by 50 days
Alex Connock Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record