ST KATHERINE'S MUSIC PARENT SUPPORTERS (SKAMPS)

Charity number: 1076462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 January 2020 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required