ST KATHERINE'S MUSIC PARENT SUPPORTERS (SKAMPS)

Charity number: 1076462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.33k £1.08k £2.15k £0 £60
Total expenditure £384 £1.13k £2.46k £1.08k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A