NORTHAMPTON AFRO-CARIBBEAN ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1075816
Charity reporting is overdue by 1039 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 674 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 674 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1039 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1039 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required