PAKISTAN AND KASHMIR WELFARE ASSOCIATION (BATLEY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the provision of education and social welfare services to the people of North Kirklees, in particular those people from a South Asian extraction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

11 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kirklees
Governance
- 15 January 2000: Standard registration
- P.K.W.A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL AZIZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED SADIQ | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHOKIT ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AZAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD ANWAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ARFAN ARIF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RIAZ HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZABAT KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOOR MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZULFICAR HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED ON 5 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BATLEY, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PAKISTANI AND KASHMIRI COMMUNITY BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE PAKISTANI AND KASHMIRI PEOPLE WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
BATLEY, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Carlton Avenue
Batley
WF17 7AJ
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- info@pkwa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window