HARROW HERITAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1072773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To secure the protection, preservation, restoration and improvement of the character and amenities of the London Borough of Harrow, for the benefit and enjoyment of the public generally and especially the inhabitants of Harrow.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £44,390
Total expenditure: £29,664

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HARROW NATURE CONSERVATION FORUM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALIM CHOWDHURY Trustee 01 June 2024
SHAHJALAL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: 81 days late
June Rosemary Baxter Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Ghazanfar Ali B.Com FMAT Trustee 07 June 2022
THE VICTORIA HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
PAKISTAN SOCIETY OF HARROW
Received: On time
Edward Youle Trustee 09 October 2019
HARROW MUSEUMS TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE HARROW MUSEUM AND HERITAGE CENTRE
Received: On time
JOHN GORDON WILLIAMS Trustee 11 October 2017
None on record
JOHN RICHARD ORCHARD Trustee 20 October 2016
None on record
MARGARET HUITSON Trustee 18 July 2016
None on record
LESLIE RUTH HONAKER BOLSOVER Trustee 16 March 2014
None on record
Cllr Janet Mote Trustee
None on record
STEVE BOLSOVER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.75k £17.23k £19.67k £122.21k £44.39k
Total expenditure £15.13k £13.25k £17.59k £59.38k £29.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £18.61k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 Walton Drive
HARROW
HA1 4XA
Phone:
0208933 2823