MANCHESTER ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1073862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.28m £3.30m £3.41m £3.19m £3.12m
Total expenditure £3.30m £3.45m £3.57m £3.43m £3.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £246.09k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.47k £15.15k £31.33k £79.35k £18.42k
Income - Other trading activities £294.30k £254.19k £3.12m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.97m £3.03m £0 £2.98m £2.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £260.11k £0 £0
Income - Other £4.91k £0 £0 £126.77k £245.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.16m £3.30m £3.57m £3.43m £3.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £143.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £17.38k £0 £0 £38.91k £33.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £152.65k £0 £0 £0