Accounts and annual returns THE ROTHERHAM YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSSOCIATION

Charity number: 1075526
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 6 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 June 2020 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 March 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required