WILLENHALL COMMUNITY MONEY ADVICE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide welfare rights and money advice services to local residents facing economic problems, to include face to face advice at Willenhall Advice Centre Offices plus other venues in neighbouring communities. Housing and working to develop the south east Credit Union and enable it to expand its savings, loans and insurance facilities within its Common Bond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £140,744 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 24 March 1999: Standard registration
- 25 May 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 25 May 2016: Funds transferred to 1015216 COVENTRY INDEPENDENT ADVICE SERVICE
- WILLENHALL ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.88k | £115.66k | £117.19k | £112.96k | £157.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.68k | £144.58k | £146.18k | £133.46k | £124.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £140.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 07 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 07 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 April 2015 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 10 April 2015 | 69 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 05 December 2014 | 308 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION OF THE RESIDENTS OF WILLENHALL AND THE SOUTH EAST AREA OF COVENTRY IN MATTERS RELATING TO PERSONAL FINANCE
Area of benefit
WILLENHALL AND THE SOUTH EAST AREA OF COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window