AFRICA ENTERPRISE TRUST

Charity number: 1075638
Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £30.02k £41.41k £26.12k £15.10k £0
Total expenditure £31.01k £31.93k £30.82k £21.96k £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A