BLAENAFON HERITAGE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a.1 To advance education of the public in the history of Blaenavon a.2 To promote, support and assist in the preservation of artifacts to achieve a.1. a.3.To carry out such other charitable purposes for the benefit of those living or working in the benefit area as the trustees in their absolute discretion from time to time decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Torfaen
Governance
- 17 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS STANLEY HUISH | Chair | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Parry | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Lloyd Evans | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET REGINA JONES CPEA | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEORGE ROYNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYN THOMAS PROBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.70k | £8.57k | £408 | £19.78k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.32k | £3.80k | £4.03k | £2.82k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF BLAENAFON 2) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION OF ARTEFACTS TO ACHIEVE C.1 3) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE BENEFIT AREA AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE;
Area of benefit
BLAENAFON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blaenavon Community Museum
Blaenavon Workmen's Hall
High Street
BLAENAVON
Torfaen
NP4 9PT
- Phone:
- 01495790991
- Email:
- blaenavonmuseum@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window