LEE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1075991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.63k £15.09k £11.42k £16.13k £5.93k
Total expenditure £16.06k £16.64k £11.66k £11.91k £7.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A